TN HB0357 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lessens from 30 to 15 days of any change, the time within which an enrollee in, and applicant for, TennCare uninsured or uninsurable coverage must notify the bureau of TennCare by mailing documentation of a material change affecting information given to the bureau or the bureau's designee on or with the person's application. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0985 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee