TN HB0356 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the number of days, from 30 days to 45, in which an employer must provide the commissioner of labor and workforce development with written notice to maintain its right to appeal an alleged violation of the Tennessee Lawful Employment Act. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, relative to employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1245 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021