TN HB0356 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows LEAs to choose whether to do payroll deduction of professional employees' organization dues; requires LEAs making payroll deduction of dues for one professional employees' organization to make payroll deduction of dues available to members of any professional employees' organization; requires an employee to request such deduction; allows an employee to rescind the authorization for a payroll deduction of dues at any time. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, allows LEAs to choose whether to do payroll deduction of professional employees' organization dues; requires LEAs making payroll deduction of dues for one professional employees' organization to make payroll deduction of dues available to members of any professional employees' organization; requires an employee to request such deduction; allows an employee to rescind the authorization for a payroll deduction of dues at any time. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Failed in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0404 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 0 PNV 1