TN HB0356 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds additional $10.00 fee to filing a divorce action with the proceeds of the fee going to the department of revenue to be placed in a fund for the funding of family violence shelters and to the Tennessee Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence for training and statewide awareness. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 4 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, adds additional $10.00 fee to filing a divorce action with the proceeds of the fee going to the department of revenue to be placed in a fund for the funding of family violence shelters and to the Tennessee Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence for training and statewide awareness. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 4 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1219 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-14 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0356&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0356.pdf |