TN HB0356 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies, in regard to design of stars on Tennessee state flag, that "the highest star shall not be placed to the right of the centerline of the circle" instead of "the highest star shall be the one nearest the upper confined corner of the flag," in order to ensure flag is properly displayed. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-301.
Title
As introduced, specifies, in regard to design of stars on Tennessee state flag, that "the highest star shall not be placed to the right of the centerline of the circle" instead of "the highest star shall be the one nearest the upper confined corner of the flag," in order to ensure flag is properly displayed. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-301.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/07/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/7/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0535 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0356&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0356.pdf |