TN HB0355 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, recognizes the Algonquian, the Chickamaugan, the Iroquoian, the Muskogean, the Siouan, and the Yuchean cultural groups as Tennessee's first peoples. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4, relative to Tennessee's first peoples.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 58
2021-03-15HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-11HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/9/2021
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Naming & Designating
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0243 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 58

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback