TN HB0346 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds the NAVPERS-660 honorable discharge certificate to the list of documents that may be submitted by an honorably discharged veteran who requests to have the "veteran" designation on a driver license. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3, relative to military veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 247 | |
2021-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0268 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021