TN HB0341 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that requirement for licensure of persons who practice medicine does not prohibit a licensed nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility from employing or contracting with a physician if the facility has a physician in the ownership structure of its controlling business entity and the employment relationship between the physician to be employed or contracted with and the nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility is evidenced by a written contract or employment agreement containing language that does not restrict the physician from exercising independent professional medical judgment in diagnosing and treating patients. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 2; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that requirement for licensure of persons who practice medicine does not prohibit a licensed nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility from employing or contracting with a physician if the facility has a physician in the ownership structure of its controlling business entity and the employment relationship between the physician to be employed or contracted with and the nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility is evidenced by a written contract or employment agreement containing language that does not restrict the physician from exercising independent professional medical judgment in diagnosing and treating patients. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 2; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 11.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259
2019-04-17HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-04-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseRef. to Health Committee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0367 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 259

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback