TN HB0340 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-15)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to civil forfeiture procedure, including requiring the district attorney general to review the underlying circumstances of a seizure to determine if probable cause exists to justify forfeiture and, when appropriate, file a motion to dismiss the application for forfeiture warrant, upon which the court shall dismiss the application and return the seized property. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to civil forfeiture procedure, including requiring the district attorney general to review the underlying circumstances of a seizure to determine if probable cause exists to justify forfeiture and, when appropriate, file a motion to dismiss the application for forfeiture warrant, upon which the court shall dismiss the application and return the seized property. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseDef. to Summer Study in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-06HouseReassigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0362 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback