TN HB0337 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, classifies the synthetic opioid "U-47700" as a Schedule I controlled substance. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, classifies the synthetic opioid "U-47700" as a Schedule I controlled substance. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0192 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee