TN HB0336 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, terminates the advisory committee on women's health, with no subsequent wind-down year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 18.
Title
As enacted, terminates the advisory committee on women's health, with no subsequent wind-down year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 30 | |
2015-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2015-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0213 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 30
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0336&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0336.pdf |