TN HB0334 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee health information committee, June 30, 2017, and clarifies that nominations from professional groups for appointment to the committee are permissive. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 56, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee health information committee, June 30, 2017, and clarifies that nominations from professional groups for appointment to the committee are permissive. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 56, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 65 | |
2015-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0257 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 65