TN HB0332 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing lights displayed on vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing lights displayed on vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378 | |
2017-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0194 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 378