TN HB0330 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from 30 to 35 years, the maximum time period during which a certain portion of state sales taxes are allocated and distributed to a municipality or industrial development corporation that finances development of an extraordinary retail or tourism facility project in a certified border region retail tourism development district. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 40, relative to the Border Region Retail Tourism Development District Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0241 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021