TN HB0330 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes requirement that an affidavit of a jailer, warden, or officer be furnished to a court to avoid forfeiture of any appearance or bail bond and instead declares that no forfeiture or conditional forfeiture of any appearance or bail bond shall be rendered where evidence of the defendant's incarceration is furnished to the court. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-201.
Title
As enacted, deletes requirement that an affidavit of a jailer, warden, or officer be furnished to a court to avoid forfeiture of any appearance or bail bond and instead declares that no forfeiture or conditional forfeiture of any appearance or bail bond shall be rendered where evidence of the defendant's incarceration is furnished to the court. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-201.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 100 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/04/2017 | |
2017-04-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-03-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0391 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 100