TN HB0328 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts medical laboratory personnel employed by privately owned labs while performing work at a medical laboratory from the requirements of the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act. - Amends TCA Section 68-1-901; Title 68, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, exempts medical laboratory personnel employed by privately owned labs while performing work at a medical laboratory from the requirements of the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act. - Amends TCA Section 68-1-901; Title 68, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0318 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee