TN HB0325 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the electronic monitoring indigency fund task force to study and make recommendations on the future of the electronic monitoring indigency fund. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 69, relative to indigency funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2021-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0887 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2022