TN HB0322 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 289
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes a school transportation supervisor program for the monitoring and oversight of transportation services for local education authorities and charter schools; requires new school bus drivers to complete a training program prior to transporting students; requires a driver to be at least 25 years of age to receive an initial school bus driver license endorsement. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21; Section 55-50-302 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes a school transportation supervisor program for the monitoring and oversight of transportation services for local education authorities and charter schools; requires new school bus drivers to complete a training program prior to transporting students; requires a driver to be at least 25 years of age to receive an initial school bus driver license endorsement. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21; Section 55-50-302 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Pub. Ch. 289
2017-05-19 Effective date(s) 01/01/2018
2017-05-04 Signed by Governor.
2017-04-26HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-04-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-25HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-04-24SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2017-04-24SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-04-19SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-17HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Education Administration & Planning
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/14/2017
2017-03-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2017-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Education Administration & Planning
2017-02-02HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1210 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 289

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback