TN HB0321 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the division of protective services to provide police services for all state office buildings; requires the division to oversee the state facility protection officer program in conjunction with the commissioner of safety or the commissioner's designee; requires that certain officer commissions be issued only to persons assigned to property owned or leased by the state. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-2006 and Section 4-3-2019.
Title
As enacted, requires the division of protective services to provide police services for all state office buildings; requires the division to oversee the state facility protection officer program in conjunction with the commissioner of safety or the commissioner's designee; requires that certain officer commissions be issued only to persons assigned to property owned or leased by the state. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-2006 and Section 4-3-2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 153 | |
2017-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1211 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 153