TN HB0320 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, alters the formula for calculating quarterly estimated payments for franchise and excise taxes; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2008 and Section 67-4-2015.
Title
As enacted, alters the formula for calculating quarterly estimated payments for franchise and excise taxes; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2008 and Section 67-4-2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 194 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2017 | |
2017-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1207 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 194