TN HB0312 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes in regard to maintaining and securing documents in certain parental rights proceedings and the grounds for termination of parental rights. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1, relative to parental rights proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253 | |
2023-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-10 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0264 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023