TN HB0309 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises present law concerning the use of assessment data. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, revises present law concerning the use of assessment data. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 192 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2017 | |
2017-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1196 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192