TN HB0308 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes an office of the guardian ad litem pilot project within the twenty-second judicial district to represent the best interest of children in dependency and neglect cases; requires the pilot project to be supervised by the secretary of state's office. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37, relative to guardians ad litem.
Sponsors
Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Withdrawn. |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0357 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0308&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB0308.pdf |