TN HB0308 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the penalty for using an unmanned aircraft over a critical infrastructure facility without the business operator's consent from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the penalty for using an unmanned aircraft over a critical infrastructure facility without the business operator's consent from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0306 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback