TN HB0307 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the board to develop and administer a two-year pilot program to award grants to students enrolled in an eligible program and to students pursuing a quality non-degree credential. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to workforce training programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30HouseWithdrawn.
2023-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2023-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration -- Government Operations for Review
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0283 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback