TN HB0306 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes licensure requirement for persons whose occupation or practice is confined solely to shampooing. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, removes licensure requirement for persons whose occupation or practice is confined solely to shampooing. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 227 | |
2017-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1194 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 227