TN HB0306 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases the fine imposed on a person who commits an assault or an aggravated assault against a health care provider while such provider is acting in the discharge of the provider's duty. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, increases the fine imposed on a person who commits an assault or an aggravated assault against a health care provider while such provider is acting in the discharge of the provider's duty. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-21SenatePub. Ch. 325
2013-05-21SenateEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-05-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2013-05-01SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-23SenateEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2013-04-16SenatePassed S., Ayes 31, Nays 1
2013-04-16SenateS. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2013-03-27HouseRcvd. from H., P1C.
2013-03-25HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2013-03-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 63, Nays 31
2013-03-25HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0132)
2013-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2013
2013-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
2013-03-13HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/13/2013
2013-03-05HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2013-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2013
2013-02-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2013
2013-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
2013-02-04HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2013-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2013-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-29HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0412 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback