TN HB0306 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the University of Tennessee to enter into certain agreements with foundations that support the university. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the University of Tennessee to enter into certain agreements with foundations that support the university. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 4 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 4 BY Herron (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 Pub. Ch. 59
2011-04-28 Effective date(s) 04/11/11
2011-04-11 Signed by Governor.
2011-04-01 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2011-04-01 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-03-30 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-03-29 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2011-03-28 H. concurred in S. am. no. 4 Ayes 96, Nays 0
2011-03-24 H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/28/2011
2011-03-21 Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2011-03-21 S. adopted am. 4
2011-03-21 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2011-03-21 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2011-03-17 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2011-03-17 Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 2
2011-03-17 H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0035)
2011-03-10 H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2011
2011-03-09 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2011
2011-03-08 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2011-03-08 Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/8/2011
2011-03-07 Re-ref. to Education Committee
2011-03-02 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/9/2011
2011-03-02 Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education
2011-02-10 P2C, ref. to Education Committee
2011-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-07 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0336 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 59

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback