TN HB0306 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises the time frame for the approval or disapproval of a plat by the municipal planning commission. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises the time frame for the approval or disapproval of a plat by the municipal planning commission. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-22 Pub. Ch. 34
2009-04-22 Effective date(s) 04/08/09
2009-04-08 Signed by Governor.
2009-03-31 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2009-03-31 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-03-30 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-03-26 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2009-03-26 Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2009-03-26 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2009-03-26 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2009-03-23 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2009-03-23 Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0
2009-03-19 Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2009
2009-03-17 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/19/2009
2009-03-17 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2009-03-11 Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/17/2009
2009-03-11 Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2009-03-04 Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/11/2009
2009-02-17 Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to State & Local Government
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-04 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0168 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 34

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback