TN HB0304 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing expedited issuance of certain professional licenses for certain armed forces members and their spouses to instead exempt such persons from licensure in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing expedited issuance of certain professional licenses for certain armed forces members and their spouses to instead exempt such persons from licensure in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 195
2019-04-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-01HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2019
2019-03-25HouseAction def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/1/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction def. in Commerce Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0384 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 195

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback