TN HB0304 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a customer from using a self-checkout machine for the purchase of beer. - Amends TCA Section 57-5-301.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a customer from using a self-checkout machine for the purchase of beer. - Amends TCA Section 57-5-301.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-03-12 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/20/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0671 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.