TN HB0300 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, encourages the commissioner of finance and administration to consult the TennCare advisory commission concerning the impact of policies and procedures on providers with respect to home- and community-based services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, encourages the commissioner of finance and administration to consult the TennCare advisory commission concerning the impact of policies and procedures on providers with respect to home- and community-based services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1466 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback