TN HB0300 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various professional regulatory provisions, including provisions regarding cosmetologists, home inspectors, and engineers. - Amends TCA Title 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various professional regulatory provisions, including provisions regarding cosmetologists, home inspectors, and engineers. - Amends TCA Title 62.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 226
2017-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-17HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-22HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
2017-02-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2017-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1188 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 226

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback