TN HB0298 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the statewide community services agency to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 3, relative to the statewide community services agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-04-05SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-03-29HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-03-25HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021
2021-03-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-20HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0077 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-05 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback