TN HB0298 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, "Charles 'Chuck' Duncheskie Memorial Parkway," Dover Crossing in City of Clarksville, Montgomery County.
Title
As enacted, "Charles 'Chuck' Duncheskie Memorial Parkway," Dover Crossing in City of Clarksville, Montgomery County.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37 | |
2009-03-30 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/30/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/26/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/26/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/19/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-03-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Rural Roads of TR | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Transportation | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0033 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 37
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0298&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0298.pdf |