TN HB0297 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, deletes requirement that the Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission file proclamations establishing hunting and fishing seasons with the county clerks for the counties affected and instead requires such proclamations be made available on the Tennessee wildlife resources agency website. - Amends TCA Section 70-4-107.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 70-4-107, relative to game and fish proclamations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 186
2023-04-03HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-03-30HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-03-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/8/2023
2023-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2023-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0236 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/24/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback