TN HB0297 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C misdemeanor the offense of possession of a small amount of marijuana not in excess of one-eighth ounce; punishes the offense by imposing a fine of no more than $50. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, reduces from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C misdemeanor the offense of possession of a small amount of marijuana not in excess of one-eighth ounce; punishes the offense by imposing a fine of no more than $50. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0265 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-07 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee