TN HB0296 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, exempts certain medical professionals from massage licensure requirements where massages for compensation are provided in the offices of such medical professionals by licensed massage therapists. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, exempts certain medical professionals from massage licensure requirements where massages for compensation are provided in the offices of such medical professionals by licensed massage therapists. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 357
2019-04-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0467 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 357

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback