TN HB0292 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-21 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-21 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes provisions related to the infections taskforce that focused on strategies and recommendations for the prevention and control of antibiotic resistant infections, including MRSA, and reported aggregate data on incidence and trends for invasive MRSA in Tennessee to the general assembly from 2008-2010. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0309 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee