TN HB0291 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires commissioners of economic and community development and revenue to evaluate certain tax credits and report to various officials; revises, modifies, and limits various other tax credit provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1; Title 67, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires commissioners of economic and community development and revenue to evaluate certain tax credits and report to various officials; revises, modifies, and limits various other tax credit provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1; Title 67, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 1 & 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03 Pub. Ch. 504
2015-06-03 Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
2015-05-20 Signed by Governor.
2015-05-08HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2015-05-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-05-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-27HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2015-04-22HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 & 2 HB0291
2015-04-21HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/22/2015
2015-04-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2015-04-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0459)
2015-04-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0420)
2015-04-21SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2015-04-13SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2015-04-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2015-04-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2015-04-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0112)
2015-04-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-02HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
2015-03-31HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015
2015-03-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-03-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/18/2015
2015-03-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2015-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
2015-03-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
2015-02-25HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
2015-02-24HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
2015-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2015
2015-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-04HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0322 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback