TN HB0287 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the week of September 17 as "Celebrate Freedom Week" in public schools; requires the department of education to provide LEAs with grade appropriate internet resources and materials for instruction for use during such week; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, designates the week of September 17 as "Celebrate Freedom Week" in public schools; requires the department of education to provide LEAs with grade appropriate internet resources and materials for instruction for use during such week; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279 | |
2017-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/21/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 279