TN HB0287 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302
2015-04-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-02HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2015
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
2015-03-31HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015
2015-03-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-03-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/18/2015
2015-03-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee
2015-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/11/2015
2015-03-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2015-02-25HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
2015-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health Committee
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-04HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0318 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 302

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback