TN HB0286 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the statute of limitations for prosecution of certain Class A or Class B felony sex offenses committed against a child on or after July 1, 2019, and deletes a provision that sets a lower statute of limitations for aggravated rape, rape of a child, rape, and aggravated rape of a child if notice of the offense is not given to law enforcement within three years of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the statute of limitations for prosecution of certain Class A or Class B felony sex offenses committed against a child on or after July 1, 2019, and deletes a provision that sets a lower statute of limitations for aggravated rape, rape of a child, rape, and aggravated rape of a child if notice of the offense is not given to law enforcement within three years of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0368 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback