TN HB0286 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of using or possessing a motor vehicle that has a compartment containing contraband or residue of contraband. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of using or possessing a motor vehicle that has a compartment containing contraband or residue of contraband. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Withdrawn. |
2017-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-10 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0235) |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1150 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (no motion)