TN HB0283 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Failed in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a hospital to offer immunization for influenza disease prior to discharging a patient who is 50 years of age or older from the hospital between October 1 and March 1; requires a hospital to offer an inpatient who is 65 years of age or older an immunization for pneumococcal disease prior to discharging the patient from the hospital. - Amends TCA Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to disease control and prevention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15HouseFailed in Health Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-08HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/15/2023
2023-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/8/2023
2023-02-28HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2023
2023-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2023-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0747 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-01 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback