TN HB0283 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 71-22)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases the punishment for a conviction of aggravated rape of a child from "15 to 60 years in prison and a fine of up to $50,000" to "life in prison without the possibility of parole." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, increases the punishment for a conviction of aggravated rape of a child from "15 to 60 years in prison and a fine of up to $50,000" to "life in prison without the possibility of parole." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors

Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]
Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]
Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]
Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. G Hardaway [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 211
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-04-23 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-08SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-08SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0210)
2019-04-08SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-02HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 2
2019-04-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0129)
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0290 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback