TN HB0283 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-22)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the punishment for a conviction of aggravated rape of a child from 15 to 60 years in prison and a fine of up to $50,000 to life in prison without the possibility of parole. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the punishment for a conviction of aggravated rape of a child from 15 to 60 years in prison and a fine of up to $50,000 to life in prison without the possibility of parole. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors

Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]
Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]
Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0290 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback