TN HB0278 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds beekeeping to practices included in the Tennessee Community Gardening Act. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 44, Chapter 15.
Title
As enacted, adds beekeeping to practices included in the Tennessee Community Gardening Act. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 44, Chapter 15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 35 | |
2017-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/30/2017 | |
2017-03-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-02-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0337 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 35