TN HB0277 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 277
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that the TBI’s completed investigative report be disclosed to the public after the district attorney general has completed its prosecutorial function; authorizes the district attorney to disclose all or part of the report prior to the record becoming a public record. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 8, Chapter 6; Title 8, Chapter 7 and Title 38.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that the TBI’s completed investigative report be disclosed to the public after the district attorney general has completed its prosecutorial function; authorizes the district attorney to disclose all or part of the report prior to the record becoming a public record. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 8, Chapter 6; Title 8, Chapter 7 and Title 38.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 277
2017-04-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-24HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-24HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2017-04-20HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017
2017-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017
2017-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-29HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
2017-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2017
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
2017-02-03HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1039 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 277

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback