TN HB0276 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds federal administrative law judges to the list of officials authorized to solemnize marriages. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Title
As enacted, adds federal administrative law judges to the list of officials authorized to solemnize marriages. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 288 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2017 | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0267 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 288